+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Business and Labor
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Business and Labor
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 02/11/2019
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 01/17/2019
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On January 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Edit
On November 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On July 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Mark Blasdel
Type:
Primary Sponsor