+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (41)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee Taxation
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Motion Failed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Taxation
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 04/08/2019
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Taxation on 04/04/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Energy and Telecommunications
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Energy and Telecommunications
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy and Telecommunications on 03/12/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Energy and Telecommunications
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 2, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 29, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Mary McNally
Type:
Primary Sponsor