+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On January 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On December 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On November 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On November 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On November 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On September 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On May 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
January 25, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
January 24, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor