+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
- Clerical Corrections Made - New Version Available
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (7)
March 27, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
March 26, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 15
March 18, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 20
February 25, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 21
February 22, 2013: AMD-1 Buttrey D/PASS
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2013: Do Pass As Amended
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
February 15, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor