+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Executive Director Final Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor