+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Process
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Failed
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Concurred as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On January 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor