+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (52)
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Override Failed in Legislature
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 22, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor