+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 25, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor