+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 10, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 100
March 12, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 22
February 21, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
February 20, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
February 17, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor