+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (51)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
On February 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On November 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor