+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Judiciary
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 03/18/2021
On February 27, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed State Administration
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed State Administration
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/17/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor