+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (44)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to Senate
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Local Government
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Local Government
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Local Government on 03/09/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Local Government
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Local Government
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Local Government
- Hearing scheduled in committee Local Government on 02/22/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Local Government
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor