+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (71)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 04/15/2019
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Appropriations
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Appropriations
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On April 13, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
On April 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 13, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Human Services
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Human Services
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Human Services on 04/09/2019
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Human Services on 04/04/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Human Services on 04/02/2019
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Human Services
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Finance and Claims
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Finance and Claims
- Taken from Table in Committee Finance and Claims
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Finance and Claims
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 02/25/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Rereferred to Committee Finance and Claims
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Public Health, Welfare and Safety
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Public Health, Welfare and Safety
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sponsor List Modified
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety on 02/13/2019
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- First Reading
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Roger Webb
Type:
Primary Sponsor