+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 100
March 8, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 20
February 11, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
February 9, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 3
February 6, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor