+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Process
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
- 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On January 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 29
February 25, 2013: Indefinitely Postpone -Wittich
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 21
February 22, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor