+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (69)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- On Motion Rules Suspended
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Hearing
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Rereferred to Committee
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Rereferred to Committee
- Hearing Canceled
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor