+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion Failed
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 02/12/2021
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On October 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On August 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor