+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 2, 2011 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On March 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 3
April 1, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 23
March 24, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
February 17, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 12
February 16, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor