+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (63)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Business and Labor
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Business and Labor
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 04/02/2019
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 03/22/2019
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed
- 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 02/13/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On October 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Mark Blasdel
Type:
Primary Sponsor