+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Process
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
- 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Fish and Game
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Fish and Game
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish and Game on 02/05/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Fish and Game
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Douglas (Doug) Kary
Type:
Primary Sponsor