+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (52)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks on 03/28/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On February 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Fish and Game
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Fish and Game
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish and Game on 02/05/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Fish and Game
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Edit
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Draft On Hold
On December 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On October 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Bruce Gillespie
Type:
Primary Sponsor