+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (49)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Human Services
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Human Services
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Human Services on 03/18/2021
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Human Services
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 02/05/2021
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor