+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
- Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On December 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor