+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Sponsors Engrossed
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
- Rereferred to Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 6
February 10, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 2
January 31, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor