+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Local Government
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Local Government
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Local Government on 03/09/2021
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Local Government
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Local Government
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Local Government
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendments Available
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Local Government on 02/03/2021
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Local Government
- First Reading
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor