+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 18, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Hearing
On January 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On November 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On November 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On November 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On October 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor