+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
On December 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
On October 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On September 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor