+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (58)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Rereferred to Committee
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Back for Requester Changes
On December 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor