+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 18, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 17, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 4
March 13, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 19
January 31, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor