+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Back for Redo
On December 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On December 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 23, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 20, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 9
March 13, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 15
February 2, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 3
January 31, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor