+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (83)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Sent to Enrolling
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Received Conference
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Conference on 04/15/2019
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report Received Conference
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed Conference
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Education
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Education
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education on 03/15/2019
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Education
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Education and Cultural Resources
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Education and Cultural Resources
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education and Cultural Resources on 01/28/2019
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee Education and Cultural Resources
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
On December 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Back for Redo
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Mike Lang
Type:
Primary Sponsor