+ − Full Texts (17)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 9, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred
On March 25, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 24, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 17, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Hearing
On February 10, 2025 in the House:
- (H) Referred to Committee
- (H) First Reading
On February 7, 2025 in the Senate:
- (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- (S) 3rd Reading Passed
- (S) Transmitted to House
On February 6, 2025 in the Senate:
- (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- (S) 2nd Reading Passed
On February 3, 2025 in the Senate:
- (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 25, 2025 in the Senate:
- (S) Hearing
On January 15, 2025 in the Senate:
- (S) Referred to Committee
On January 14, 2025 in the Senate:
- (S) Introduced
- (S) First Reading
On January 14, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 10, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 9, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft in Assembly
On January 8, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft in Input/Proofing
- (LC) Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 7, 2025 in the House:
- (LC) Draft in Legal Review
- (LC) Draft in Edit
On December 28, 2024 in the House:
- (LC) Drafter Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2025: (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred - Do Concur
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 56
February 7, 2025: (S) 3rd Reading Passed - Do Pass
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 20
February 6, 2025: (S) 2nd Reading Passed - Do Pass
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 22
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor