+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On March 23, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Sponsors Engrossed
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sponsor List Modified
- Hearing
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On January 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 23, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
March 22, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 14
March 20, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
January 29, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
January 28, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor