+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (53)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Agriculture
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Agriculture
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Agriculture on 03/14/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Agriculture
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
- Printed - New Version Available
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation on 01/24/2019
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Bruce Gillespie
Type:
Primary Sponsor