+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for Referendum Proposal Transmittal
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft Taken by Drafter
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On November 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
David E Wanzenried
Type:
Primary Sponsor