+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (44)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Returned to Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred State Administration
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred State Administration
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 03/20/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Education and Cultural Resources
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Education and Cultural Resources
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education and Cultural Resources on 02/13/2019
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Education and Cultural Resources
- First Reading
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Daniel R Salomon
Type:
Primary Sponsor