+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks on 04/02/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Fish, Wildlife and Parks
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Fish and Game
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Fish and Game
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish and Game on 01/31/2019
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Fish and Game
- First Reading
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On December 17, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On December 14, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 7, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 13, 2018 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Jill Cohenour
Type:
Primary Sponsor