+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
- Hearing
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On November 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On May 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor