+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 22
February 4, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 22
January 31, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor