+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Sponsors Engrossed
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Taken from Table in Committee
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On December 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
On November 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 4
April 15, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
April 12, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
January 29, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
January 28, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor