+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (66)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 04/15/2019
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Appropriations
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Appropriations
On April 13, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Judiciary
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 03/18/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Finance and Claims
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Finance and Claims
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 02/14/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee Finance and Claims
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Judiciary
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 01/23/2019
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Jen Gross
Type:
Primary Sponsor