+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred State Administration
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred State Administration
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 03/12/2021
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed State Administration
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed State Administration
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/03/2021
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On January 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On September 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor