+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (56)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
- Chapter Number Assigned
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Appropriations
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Appropriations
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 02/16/2021
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred State Administration
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred State Administration
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/10/2021
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Finance and Claims
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Finance and Claims
- Hearing scheduled in committee Finance and Claims on 01/27/2021
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee Finance and Claims
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor