+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested
- Introduced
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On November 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 13
March 11, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 8
February 18, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 14
February 6, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor