+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Failed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Motion Carried
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Taken from Table in Committee
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Motion Failed
- Tabled in Committee
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 14, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Canceled
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Rereferred to Committee
On February 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Fiscal Note Requested
On January 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On December 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On December 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On November 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On October 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (13)
April 21, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 52
April 20, 2015: Take from Comm-Lamm
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 46
April 14, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 1
April 10, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 7
April 8, 2015: Take from Comm-Schwaderer
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 54
February 24, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 16
February 23, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 15
February 20, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 4
February 11, 2015: AMD-2 Moe D/PASS
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 32
February 11, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 16
February 11, 2015: AMD-3 Facey D/PASS
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 29
February 11, 2015: AMD-1 Cohenour D/PASS
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 32
February 6, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor