+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (47)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Sponsors Engrossed
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Sponsor List Modified
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Assembly
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor