+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On December 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On December 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On December 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On October 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 11, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 20
January 30, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
January 23, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor