+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (44)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to Senate
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Business and Labor
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Business and Labor
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 02/05/2021
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 01/15/2021
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On December 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor