+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (44)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to House
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Taxation
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Taxation
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 03/16/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Taxation
- First Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 02/24/2021
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Taxation
On February 13, 2021 in the House:
- Amendments Available
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 17, 2021 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor