+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Motion to Reconsider Failed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Business and Labor
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Business and Labor
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 04/16/2019
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
- Introduced
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Executive Director Final Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Draft On Hold
On December 29, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Jessica Karjala
Type:
Primary Sponsor